Ansari, Parvez (CPSO#: 27608)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Jiwaji University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. J. Rakem (76600) took over Dr. Ansari's practice, including all charts, created up to the year 2008 in Welland. Patients who would like their records should approach Dr. Rakem. Dr. Ansari indicated that after 2008 he performed assessments for insurance companies. Dr. Ansari explained that all the records remained with the respective companies and/or assessment centers. Dr. Ansari stated that lawyers or patients who wish to obtain copies should forward requests directly to the insurance companies.
Date Received: 24 Jul 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2013