Ansari, Zeba Intikhab (CPSO#: 64261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Oakville Health Centre
1060 Speers Road
Suite 208
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 339-0008
Fax: (905) 842-8001
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zeba Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ansari ( CPSO# 64261 )

Business Address:
The Oakville Health Centre
Suite 208
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 339-0008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZEBA INTIKHAB ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996