Anthes, David Lorne (CPSO#: 69091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
White Cedar Health Care Centre
125 Vickers Street South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1J2
Phone: (807) 475-4357
Fax: (807) 623-6141
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Anthes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Anthes ( CPSO# 69091 )

Business Address:
White Cedar Health Care Centre
125 Vickers Street South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1J2
Phone Number: (807) 475-4357

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LORNE ANTHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTHES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997