Anthony, Robert Gordon (CPSO#: 29041)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please send your request to r.anthony.md@gmail.com
Date Received: 21 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014