Antman, Neil Steven (CPSO#: 64383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Intensive Care Unit
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Antman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Antman ( CPSO# 64383 )

Business Address:
Intensive Care Unit
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL STEVEN ANTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1991