Antoniadis, Gregory Antonios (CPSO#: 60931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wingham Medical Centre
7-271 Frances St
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone: (519) 357-2500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edmonds-Antoniadis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Antoniadis ( CPSO# 60931 )
Dr. G. Edmonds ( CPSO# 76383 )

Business Address:
Wingham & District Hospital
285 Catherine Street
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200

Business Address:
271 Frances Street
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ANTONIOS ANTONIADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONIADIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1990