Anvari, Mehran (CPSO#: 54438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Surgery
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-2951
Fax: (905) 521-6113
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehran Anvari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anvari ( CPSO# 54438 )

Business Address:
Department of Surgery
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
8th Floor, G805
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-2951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHRAN ANVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANVARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1989