Anwan, Jane Ekpo (CPSO#: 29684)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2004