Anwar, Sara (CPSO#: 105158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA ANWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANWAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2014 to 30 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016