Anweiler, Laura Lynn (CPSO#: 62111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 168
1055 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5V1
Phone: (613) 536-3006
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA LYNN ANWEILER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANWEILER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1992