Anyanwu, Leonard Uchewuba (CPSO#: 87850)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ibadan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2011