Apkon, Michael (CPSO#: 104103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2014

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Washington University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Room 1410
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6489
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Michael Apkon may practise medicine only, 

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                  Paediatrics, University ofToronto, in which Dr. Apkon holds an academic
                  appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Apkon no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note: This certificate is issued on June 23, 2014, and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of August 31, 2018.  The expiry date of this certificate may
                  be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.