Apostol, Alexandru (CPSO#: 75949)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bucharest, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 08 Apr 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2002