Appavoo, Samuel Devadason (CPSO#: 63204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road
Goderich ON  N7A 4N3
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Appavoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Appavoo ( CPSO# 63204 )

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Business Address:
Alexandria Marine General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8323

Business Address:
Maitland Manor Nursing Home
290 South Street
Goderich ON  N7A 4G6
Phone Number: (519) 524-7324

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL DEVADASON APPAVOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPAVOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 27 Nov 1990 to 06 Jan 1991
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 07 Jan 1991 to 25 Jan 1991
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1992