Appelton, Alison Ellen (CPSO#: 82965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: Organek, Alison (used until: 27 Apr 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peninsula Family Health Team
24 Moore Street
Lions Head ON  N0H 1W0
Phone: 519-793-3445
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Appelton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Appelton ( CPSO# 82965 )

Business Address:
Peninsula Family Health Team
24 Moore Street
Lions Head ON  N0H 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 793-4604

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Apr 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON ELLEN APPELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPELTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2009