Appleton, Darryl Evan (CPSO#: 79801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appleton Clinic
Suite 301
845 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1E6
Phone: (416) 635-0909
Fax: (416) 635-0300
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darryl Appleton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 22 2007

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 13, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Darryl Evan Appleton,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Appleton to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. DARRYL EVAN APPLETON  
                                          ("Dr. Appleton")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                                                                                     


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Appleton, certificate of registration number 79801, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (2)   I, Dr. Appleton, am the Licensee, Quality Advisor, Medical Director and
                  primary physician practicing at the licensed independent health facility
                  known as Appleton Clinic Sleep Centre (the "Facility").  

            (3)   I, Dr. Appleton, acknowledge that the Facility investigates and treats
                  sleep-related issues in patients ages 13 and up.  The Facility was
                  assessed in December 2015 by the College as directed by the Director -
                  Independent Health Facilities (the "Director") at the Ministry of Health
                  and Long Term Care pursuant to section 27(3) of the Independent Health
                  Facilities Act, R.S.O. 1990, c. 13.  As a result, the College received
                  information regarding the services provided at the Facility.


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Appleton, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                  this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            No sleep studies to occur without a local responsible sleep medicine physician

            (5)   I, Dr. Appleton, undertake that no sleep studies will be performed at the
                  Facility unless a sleep medicine physician who is located within
                  reasonable driving distance of the Facility has agreed in advance to be
                  responsible for the health of patients while such patients are undergoing
                  sleep studies at the Facility.  

            No therapy to be prescribed without assessment by a physician

            (6)   I, Dr. Appleton, undertake that no patient of the Facility will be
                  prescribed CPAP therapy or any other sleep medicine therapy without first
                  being assessed by a sleep medicine physician.

            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Appleton, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of the Facility and patient
                        records at the Facility by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Appleton, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Director for information in regard to
                        the dates upon which sleep studies are conducted at the Facility,
                        in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the
                        provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Appleton, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Appleton, acknowledge that this Undertaking will be effective as
                  long as I remain the Licensee, Quality Advisor, Medical Director or
                  primary physician practicing at the Facility.

            (10)  I, Dr. Appleton, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Appleton, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Appleton, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Appleton, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Appleton is the Licensee, Quality Advisor, Medical Director and
                        primary physician practicing at an Independent Health Facility
                        known as Appleton Clinic Sleep Centre located at 845 Wilson Avenue,
                        North York, ON.  
                  
                        The Facility was assessed by the College in December 2015 as
                        directed by the Director - Independent Health Facilities pursuant
                        to section 27(3) of the Independent Health Facilities Act, R.S.O.
                        1990, c. 13.  
                  
                        As a result of the assessment, Dr. Appleton has undertaken that:
                  
                        1.    No sleep studies will be performed at the Facility unless a
                              sleep medicine physician who is located within reasonable
                              driving distance of the Facility has agreed in advance to be
                              responsible for the health of patients while such patients
                              are undergoing sleep studies at the Facility; and
                  
                        2.    No patient of the Facility will be prescribed CPAP therapy or
                              any other sleep medicine therapy without first being assessed
                              by a sleep medicine physician.
                  
                  
            CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Appleton, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of an assessment of my practice or the Facility:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Appleton, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any practice location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Appleton, give my irrevocable consent to all assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to an assessment of my practice or the Facility;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Darryl Evan Appleton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 13, 2016:

Dr. Appleton is the Licensee, Quality Advisor, Medical Director and primary physician practicing at an Independent Health Facility known as Appleton Clinic Sleep Centre located at 845 Wilson Avenue, North York, ON.

The Facility was assessed by the College in December 2015 as directed by the Director – Independent Health Facilities pursuant to section 27(3) of the Independent Health Facilities Act, R.S.O. 1990, c. 13.

As a result of the assessment, Dr. Appleton has undertaken that:

1. No sleep studies will be performed at the Facility unless a sleep medicine physician who is located within reasonable driving distance of the Facility has agreed in advance to be responsible for the health of patients while such patients are undergoing sleep studies at the Facility; and

2. No patient of the Facility will be prescribed CPAP therapy or any other sleep medicine therapy without first being assessed by a sleep medicine physician.