Appoloni Moreira, Thiago (CPSO#: 104146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THIAGO APPOLONI MOREIRA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. APPOLONI MOREIRA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. APPOLONI MOREIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. APPOLONI MOREIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. APPOLONI MOREIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. APPOLONI MOREIRA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. APPOLONI MOREIRA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017