Apramian, David Alan (CPSO#: 32276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Apramian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Apramian ( CPSO# 32276 )

Business Address:
Burks Falls and District Hospital
150 Huston Street
Burks Falls ON  P0A 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 382-4020

Business Address:
5 Park Street
Sundridge ON  P0A 1Z0
Phone Number: (705) 498-5495

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc, 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALAN APRAMIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APRAMIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1981