Aquino, John Michael (CPSO#: 63809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6A 3B2
Phone: (416) 512-6366
Fax: (416) 512-6361
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

15 Allan Dr
Bolton, ON
Bolton ON  L7E 2B5
Canada
Phone: 9059511234
Fax: 9059516090
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL AQUINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AQUINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992