Aquino Jr, Jose (CPSO#: 58341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
2nd Floor, Room L2121a
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8830
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL-CIVIC CAMPUS
DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAL IMAGING
1053 CARLING AVE
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8571
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL-RIVERSIDE CAMPU
1967 RIVERSIDE DR
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8571
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Merivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Canada
Phone: (613) 727-1072 Ext. 231
Fax: (613) 727-5873
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

350 John St N
Arnprior and District Memorial Hosp
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Winchester District Memorial HOsp
Dept. of Medical Imaging
566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Almonte General Hosp
75 Spring St SS1
Dept of Medical Imaging
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St north
Renfrew, Ontario
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

St Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay, Ontario
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose Aquino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aquino Jr ( CPSO# 58341 )

Business Address:
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street SS1
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6

Business Address:
St Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1T0

Business Address:
Merivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5476

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 761-5476

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5476

Business Address:
556 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE AQUINO JR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AQUINO JR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1989