Ara, Shamim (CPSO#: 85113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Room W6787
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3067
Fax: (705) 876-5008
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shamim Ara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ara ( CPSO# 85113 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMIM ARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 12 Aug 2009 to 11 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 12 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011