Arab, Abeer Ahmed Hasan (CPSO#: 79642)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Jun 2003 to 27 Aug 2003
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2003 to 27 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2004 to 27 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2005 to 27 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2006 to 27 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010