Arab, Tarek Samir Abdullah (CPSO#: 84229)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2012