Arab-O'Brien, Donna Martha (CPSO#: 59847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: Arab, Donna Martha (used until: 03 Jan 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 306 - Sunnyside East
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6466
Fax: (416) 530-6510
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arab-O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Arab-O'Brien ( CPSO# 59847 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
306 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6466

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA MARTHA ARAB-O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAB-O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1994