Arabi, Nezhat (CPSO#: 94482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian, Turkish

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fanshawe Family Medical centre
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 645-2444
Fax: (519) 645-2545
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Nezhat Arabi may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.