Arango Arango, Miguel Fernando (CPSO#: 80461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C - University Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arango Arango Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arango Arango ( CPSO# 80461 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicnie
LHSC - University Campus Site
PO Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 2004 to 10 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Mar 2004 to 29 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Miguel Fernando Arango Arango may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia  and  Perioperative  Medicine,  University  of  Western
                        Ontario,  in  which Dr. Arango Arango holds an academic appointment
                        at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when  Dr. Arango
                  Arango no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.