Arango, Pablo Miguel (CPSO#: 80310)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2003 to 04 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2004