Arani, Arash Mark (CPSO#: 72275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Forghanian-Arani, Arash (used until: 23 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
581 Argus Road
Suite 300
Oakville ON  L6J 3J4
Phone: (905) 338-9900
Fax: (905) 338-9904
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arash Arani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arani ( CPSO# 72275 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
581 Argus Road
Oakville ON  L6J 3J4
Phone Number: (905) 338-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARASH MARK ARANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000