Arato, Mihaly (CPSO#: 53318)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1990