Araujo, Adilson Adriano Machado (CPSO#: 67988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
5030 Tenth Line West
Mississauga ON  L5M 7Z5
Phone: (905) 607-0700
Fax: (905) 607-0779
Electoral District: 05


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ADILSON ADRIANO MACHADO ARAUJO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAUJO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996