Araujo, Gonzalo (CPSO#: 50010)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central de Venezuela, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Mar 2008

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: March 11, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking, effective March 11, 2008, by Dr. Gonzalo Araujo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (Note: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
(1) I, DR. GONZALO ARAUJO, undertake to resign from the College immediately. (2)I undertake to never apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practice medicine in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction in Canada. (3) I undertake to notify the College if I ever apply for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction outside Canada. (4) I acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated September 12, 2007, for engaging in sexual impropriety with a patient and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of a patient, and also to discontinue its outstanding Registrar’s investigation. (5) By entering into this Undertaking, I do not admit any of the allegations and deny all of the allegations.( 6) I agree that should the College become aware that I have: (a) applied for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction in Canada; or (b) failed to notify the College of my application for a licence to practice medicine in any other jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the above-noted allegations and shall have the right to proceed with the above-noted investigation. (7) I acknowledge that any breach of this undertaking may constitute professional misconduct.