Arboleda-Florez, Julio Ernesto (CPSO#: 24979)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seen at Belleville General Hospital please contact: Belleville General Hospital 265 Dundas Street East Belleville, ON K8N 5A9 For patients seen at the Princess Street office in Kingston please write to: Dr. J.E. Arboleda-Florez 483 River Ridge Drive Glenburnie, ON K0H 1S0
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Dec 1966 to 30 Jun 1967
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1967 to 30 Jun 1968
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1968 to 30 Jun 1969
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1969 to 30 Jun 1970
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1970 to 30 Jun 1971
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016