Arbus, Gerald Stanley (CPSO#: 22501)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010