Archer, Brian Donald (CPSO#: 59581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint John Regional Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
P O Box 2100
Saint John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 648-6918

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DONALD ARCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989