Archer, Derek Christopher (CPSO#: 56717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
L5M 2N1
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: 905 8280653
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK CHRISTOPHER ARCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987