Archibald, Nicole Lynne (CPSO#: 83562)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 26 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007