Archibald, Samuel Bruce Wallace (CPSO#: 61213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Craig Street
Box 69
Russell ON  K4R 1C7
Phone: (613) 445-5333
Fax: (613) 445-3659
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wallace Archibald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Archibald ( CPSO# 61213 )

Business Address:
110 Craig Street
Russell ON  K4R 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 445-5333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL BRUCE WALLACE ARCHIBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIBALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1990