Archibald, Susy Raymonde (CPSO#: 60648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aldershot Family Health
Organization
501 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7T 2E2
Phone: (905) 681-9200
Fax: (905) 681-9404
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Archibald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Archibald ( CPSO# 60648 )

Business Address:
Aldershot Family Health Organization
2nd Floor
501 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7T 2E2
Phone Number: (905) 681-9200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSY RAYMONDE ARCHIBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIBALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1990