Archie, Suzanne Marie (CPSO#: 58089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cleghorn Program
West 5th Campus, St. Joseph's Healt
100 West 5th Street
Level 0
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36586
Fax: (905) 525-2805
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Archie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Archie ( CPSO# 58089 )
Dr. P. Bzonek ( CPSO# 58099 )

Business Address:
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Cleghorn Program
703 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE ARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1988