Arcieri-Piersanti, Vincenzo (CPSO#: 31521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5022
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Haliburton Highlands Health Service
Minden Hospital
P O Box 149
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 286-2288
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Arcieri-Piersanti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Arcieri-Piersanti ( CPSO# 31521 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Haliburton Highlands Health Service
Minden Hospital
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENZO ARCIERI-PIERSANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCIERI-PIERSANTI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1980