Aref, Ibrahim Mohamed Mohamed (CPSO#: 56308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Henry Ford Hospital
2799 West Grand Boulevard
Detroit MI  48202-2608
United States
Phone: (586) 263-2242

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MOHAMED MOHAMED AREF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AREF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991