Arekat, Zaid Rushdi Khalil (CPSO#: 68547)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997