Arfeen, Syed Najmul (CPSO#: 99996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Bengali, English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
J.A.Hildes Northern Medical Unit
University of Manitoba
Basic Medical sciences Building.
665-745 Banatyne Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0J9
Phone: (204) 789 3711
Fax: 204 774 8919
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Great Lakes Medical Centre
25-B Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2S5
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-0302
Fax: (905) 494-0754
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Rexdale Doctors Clinic
1530 Albion Road. Unit 39A
Rexdale ON  M9V 1B4
Canada
Phone: 416 744 3019
Fax: 416 744 6560
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Arfeen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arfeen ( CPSO# 99996 )

Business Address:
25-B Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2S5
Phone Number: (905) 494-0302

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba
Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED NAJMUL ARFEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARFEEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2013 to 01 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015