Argent, Nicholas Boyd (CPSO#: 64410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Floor 5, Holland Cross Tower B
1600 Scott Street
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 948-7456
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS BOYD ARGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARGENT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1994