Argintaru, Niran (CPSO#: 103155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5959
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.   Niran   Argintaru  shall  practise  medicine  as  required  by  the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. Argintaru is enrolled
                  at the University of Toronto.

            (2)   In  Dr.  Argintaru's  practice  in  the  postgraduate  medical  education
                  program, Dr. Argintaru shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-
                  patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                  department  where  Dr.  Argintaru  is properly practising medicine and to
                  which postgraduate trainees are regularly  assigned  by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr.  Argintaru's  practice  in  the  postgraduate  medical  education
                  program, Dr. Argintaru shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Argintaru may practise:

                  (a)   adult critical care medicine and to the extent of his employment at
                        Hamilton  Health  Sciences Corporation and St. Joseph's  Healthcare
                        Hamilton,  while under  supervision  coordinated  by  a  supervisor
                        acceptable to the College;
                  
                  (b)   emergency medicine  and  to  the  extent of his employment at Royal
                        Victoria Hospital Barrie, while under  supervision coordinated by a
                        supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (c)   emergency  medicine  and  to  the  extent  of   his  employment  at
                        Collingwood  General and Marine Hospital Collingwood,  while  under
                        supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            (5)   In Dr. Argintaru's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Argintaru may
                  not charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of   registration  expires,  and  Dr.  Argintaru  must
                  thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical
                  education program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Argintaru   is  no  longer  enrolled  in  a  program  of
                        postgraduate medical education  provided  by  a  medical  school in
                        Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr. Argintaru no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid  employment authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and  Dr.  Argintaru must  immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisors identified  in  paragraph (4) notify the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Argintaru's  practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisors  are  no  longer  able or willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Argintaru's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.  Argintaru to engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Argintaru's  employment  as  specified  in  paragraph  (4)
                        ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if  Dr. Argintaru takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education  program  specified in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the   event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Argintaru may not resume any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Argintaru applies for a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is issued on January  1,  2017.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this  certificate  of  registration  expires  on June 30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.