Arif, Muhammad (CPSO#: 91878)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muhammad Arif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 17 Jul 2009 to 21 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 22 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014