Arif, Stephen G. (CPSO#: 57220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
417 10th Avenue
P.O Box 2769
Invermere BC  V0A 1K0
Phone: (250) 341-6900
Fax: (250) 341-3226

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN G. ARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1987