Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Arlen, Dianne Josephine (CPSO#: 60722)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dianne J. Arlen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Healthcare Division of Nephrology 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton, ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 11 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2017