Armaganijan, Luciana Vidal (CPSO#: 88146)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Mar 2008 to 19 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 20 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010