Armeland, Jessica Danielle (CPSO#: 100900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Friedlich, Jessica Danielle (used until: 11 Nov 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto ON  M6K 2R8
Phone: (416) 597 3422
Fax: 416 597 3064
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA DANIELLE ARMELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMELAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015